This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 02:57:59 (UTC).

JANNINE ROSE FERRAND VS KLL FINANCIAL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 JANNINE ROSE FERRAND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KLL FINANCIAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2260

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRAND JANNINE ROSE

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Defendants

KLL FINANCIAL

KLS FINANCIAL

15233 Ventura Blvd Suite 704$

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/21/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/21/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/22/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/22/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/22/2017

5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/5/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Jannine Rose Ferrand (Plaintiff); As to: KLS Financial (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/21/2017 to 09/18/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/18/2017 to 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 05/22/2017 to 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/21/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Updated -- KLS Financial (Defendant): Organization Name changed from KLL Financial to KLS Financial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jannine Rose Ferrand (Plaintiff); As to: KLL Financial (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/03/2017; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jannine Rose Ferrand (Plaintiff); As to: KLL Financial (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jannine Rose Ferrand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011049 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less