This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 00:09:36 (UTC).

RAEF GUIRGES VS ARMANDO BURCIAGA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 RAEF GUIRGES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARMANDO BURCIAGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2254

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUIRGES RAEF

Torrance, CA 90501

Defendants

CLEAN RAYS ENERGY INC.

600 S. Garfield Ave.,

Alhambra, CA 91802

BURCIAGA ARMANDO

Monterey Park, CA 91754

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

11/17/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal re: hearing) of 11/17/2017

11/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal re: hearing) of 11/17/2017

Request for Court Order and Answer

1/11/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

1/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

RETURNED MAIL - Request for court order and answer

2/1/2018: RETURNED MAIL - Request for court order and answer

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Answer on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

8/18/2017: Answer on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

8/11/2017: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/14/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial (re: after motion to vacate))

7/14/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial (re: after motion to vacate))

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

7/17/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/06/2017

7/6/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/06/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

7/6/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

6/6/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

5/19/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/18/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Armando Burciaga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Request for court order and answer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Armando Burciaga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketAnswer on Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Raef Guirges (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Armando Burciaga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketTrial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketTrial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal re: hearing scheduled for 11/17/2016 at 10:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department O

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/18/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Raef Guirges against Defendant CLEAN RAYS ENERGY INC. Defendant Armando Burciaga on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Raef Guirges on 03/22/2017 for the principal amount of $10,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $10,115.00, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Raef Guirges (Plaintiff); As to: Armando Burciaga (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Raef Guirges on 03/22/2017, Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to CLEAN RAYS ENERGY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Raef Guirges (Plaintiff); As to: Armando Burciaga (Defendant); CLEAN RAYS ENERGY INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011031 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011031 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less