This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 23:29:21 (UTC).

ANTONIO MORENO VS JUAN CARLOS TORREZ

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 ANTONIO MORENO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN CARLOS TORREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2252

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO ANTONIO

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Defendant

TORREZ JUAN CARLOS

Redondo Beach, CA 90277

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

(Los Angeles)

9/19/2017: (Los Angeles)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

Minute Order of 07/07/2017

7/7/2017: Minute Order of 07/07/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

7/7/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

6/6/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

6/6/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/18/2017: Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Antonio Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Carlos Torrez (Defendant); Interest: 85.15; Service Date: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Result Date: 07/07/2017; Disposition Type: Denied; Disposition Date changed from 07/07/2017 to 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/07/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Juan Carlos Torrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0013745 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Antonio Moreno against Defendant Juan Carlos Torrez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Antonio Moreno on 03/22/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,590.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Antonio Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Carlos Torrez (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Antonio Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Carlos Torrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011026 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011026 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less