This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2019 at 18:28:31 (UTC).

CAMERON ROPER VS BABA CARS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 CAMERON ROPER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BABA CARS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2251

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROPER CAMERON

Hawthorne, CA 90251

Defendant

BABA CARS LLC

16129 Sherman Way,

Van Nuys, CA 91406

Assignee

VAN NUYS FINANCIAL

13547 Ventura Boulevard #550

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/15/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer, Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

10/4/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer, Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

10/16/2018: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

10/29/2018: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

11/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

3/29/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...) of 03/27/2018

3/27/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...) of 03/27/2018

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order (Non-Appearance)) of 10/16/2017

10/16/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order (Non-Appearance)) of 10/16/2017

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 10/06/2017

10/6/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 10/06/2017

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/22/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

9/11/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

8/30/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

9/8/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/25/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/30/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 04/02/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Cameron Roper (Plaintiff) to Cameron Roper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cameron Roper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Baba Cars LLC (Defendant) to Baba Cars LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Cameron Roper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Cameron Roper against Defendant Baba Cars LLC on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Cameron Roper on 03/23/2017 for the principal amount of $2,750.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,840.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $90.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Baba Cars LLC. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cameron Roper (Plaintiff); As to: Baba Cars LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cameron Roper (Plaintiff); As to: Baba Cars LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cameron Roper (Plaintiff); As to: Baba Cars LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cameron Roper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011025 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less