This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 19:25:46 (UTC).

LIDA YAZDAN PANAH VS THE CANNIBAL CULVER CITY, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 LIDA YAZDAN PANAH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE CANNIBAL CULVER CITY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2248

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PANAH LIDA YAZDAN

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Defendants

THE CANNIBAL CULVER CITY LLC DBA THE CANNIBAL LA

803 Navy Street

Santa Monica, CA 90405

LANE CORY

Santa Monica, CA 90405

CANNIBAL BEER & BUTCHER

803 Navy Street,

Santa Monica, CA 90405

THE CANNIBAL BEER & BUTCHER

8850 Washington Ave,

Culver City, CA 90232

THE CANNIBAL CULVER CITY LLC DBA THE CANNIBAL BEER & BUTCHER

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance)) of 09/29/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/29/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance)) of 09/29/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

RETURNED MAIL - minute order of 06/14/2017 and judgment debtor statement of assets.

7/10/2017: RETURNED MAIL - minute order of 06/14/2017 and judgment debtor statement of assets.

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/14/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/5/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

2/6/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance)) of 01/04/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/4/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order (Non-Appearance)) of 01/04/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

1/4/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

RETURNED MAIL - REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER

12/18/2017: RETURNED MAIL - REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER

Minute Order - (Court Order (Non-Appearance))

11/20/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order (Non-Appearance))

RETURNED MAIL - Minute order of 09/29/2017

10/16/2017: RETURNED MAIL - Minute order of 09/29/2017

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

9/29/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/14/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - (Reset)

4/4/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - (Reset)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

9/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/18/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Court Order and Answer

8/18/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

8/18/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cory Lane (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff); As to: The Cannibal Culver City, LLC (Defendant); Cory Lane (Defendant); The Cannibal Beer & Butcher (Defendant); Interest: 64.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Minute Order of 11/15/2017; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Minute Order of 11/15/2017; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cory Lane (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cory Lane (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff); As to: The Cannibal Culver City, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff); As to: Cory Lane (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) (Reset); Filed by: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketPayment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011459 (Credit Card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lida Yazdan Panah (Plaintiff); As to: The Cannibal Culver City, LLC (Defendant); Cory Lane (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011018 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less