This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 12:16:21 (UTC).

DEBBIE HOVSEPIAN, ET AL. VS WILLIAM STEVEN SNELL TRUSTEE, SNELL FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 DEBBIE HOVSEPIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAM STEVEN SNELL TRUSTEE, SNELL FAMILY TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2247

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOVSEPIAN DEBBIE

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

HOVSEPIAN VAROOI

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant

WILLIAM STEVEN SNELL TRUSTEE SNELL FAMILY TRUST

Calabasas, CA 91302

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Unknown

8/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/2/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2017

8/2/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/2/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

[Notice of Rejection]

7/26/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

7/26/2017: Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/27/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

[Notice of Rejection]

6/28/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

6/28/2017: Notice of Rejection

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

6/1/2017: Notice of Postponement

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Debbie Hovsepian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Rejection Sheet FAX FILING REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - Rejected; Submitted by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011012 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $5.25; Balance: $5.25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Payment: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $5.25 Receipt: IW-2017-0011014 (Credit Card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Debbie Hovsepian (Plaintiff); Varooi Hovsepian (Plaintiff); As to: William Steven Snell Trustee, Snell Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less