This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 19:42:36 (UTC).

KEHAR KHATRI VS EDGAR SARGSYAN

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 KEHAR KHATRI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDGAR SARGSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2245

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHATRI KEHAR

Tarzana, CA 91356

Defendant

SARGSYAN EDGAR

North Hollywood, CA 91606

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: ANNAYET /SAID SHE WAS EDGAR SARGSYAN'S WIFE

3/27/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: ANNAYET /SAID SHE WAS EDGAR SARGSYAN'S WIFE

Other - (name extension) - FAX CONFIRMATION

3/22/2017: Other - (name extension) - FAX CONFIRMATION

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court] COURTESY COPY

3/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court] COURTESY COPY

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

8/4/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/13/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/13/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/17/2017

5/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/17/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 08/07/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/13/2017 to 08/07/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Kehar Khatri (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Sargsyan (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: ANNAYET /SAID SHE WAS EDGAR SARGSYAN'S WIFE: Result Date changed from 05/17/2017 to 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/13/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Kehar Khatri against Defendant Edgar Sargsyan on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kehar Khatri on 03/20/2017 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $120.00 for a total of $1,120.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: ANNAYET /SAID SHE WAS EDGAR SARGSYAN'S WIFE: Result: Result Date: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011002 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Facsimile Filing Verification Fee - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Payment: 4.50 Receipt: IW-2017-0011002 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court] COURTESY COPY; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Balance: $4.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketPayment: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $4.50 Receipt: IW-2017-0011011 (Credit Card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketOther - FAX CONFIRMATION; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kehar Khatri (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Sargsyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less