This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 12:15:55 (UTC).

NEDDA NIKZAD, ET AL. VS UNITED ESTATE PLANNING, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 NEDDA NIKZAD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED ESTATE PLANNING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2241

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NIKZAD NEDDA

Los Angeles, CA 90077

NIKZAD ALI

Los Angeles, CA 90077

Defendant

UNITED ESTATE PLANNING INC.

500 N. State College Blvd., Suite 1100,

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/21/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/21/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Unknown

7/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/27/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2017

7/27/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

6/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET FROM COURTROOM

6/5/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET FROM COURTROOM

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

4/6/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nedda Nikzad (Plaintiff); Ali Nikzad (Plaintiff); As to: United Estate Planning, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/22/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) RESET FROM COURTROOM; Filed by: Nedda Nikzad (Plaintiff); Ali Nikzad (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $1.50; Balance: $1.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170321E6583 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170321E6583 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nedda Nikzad (Plaintiff); Ali Nikzad (Plaintiff); As to: United Estate Planning, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less