This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 00:12:31 (UTC).

HONG CHONG VS WEST COAST DENTAL SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 HONG CHONG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEST COAST DENTAL SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2240

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHONG HONG DBA WEST COAST DENTAL/AB DBA MINA AB

Gardena, CA 90248

Defendant

WEST COAST DENTAL SERVICE INC. DBA WEST COAST DENTAL OF TORRANCE

1730 Sepulveda Blvd., # 1

Torrance, CA 90501

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/20/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/20/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/20/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/20/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/20/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/20/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/20/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/19/2017

5/19/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/19/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/20/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/20/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Hong Chong DBA Mina Ab, DBA West coast dental/Ab against Defendant West Coast Dental Service, Inc. DBA West Coast Dental Of Torrance on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Hong Chong on 03/20/2017 for the principal amount of $600.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $725.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: West Coast Dental Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Hong Chong (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Dental Service, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/03/2017; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170321E6854 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170321E6854 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hong Chong (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Dental Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less