This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 12:15:50 (UTC).

PARK CITY AIR CRUISE & TRAVEL, INC VS CARLOS ANDROVER GONZALES

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 PARK CITY AIR CRUISE TRAVEL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARLOS ANDROVER GONZALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2239

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK CITY AIR CRUISE & TRAVEL INC DBA SANTA MONICA CRUISE TOUR AND TRAVEL CENTER INC

Po Box 680016

Park City, UT 84068

Defendant

GONZALES CARLOS ANDROVER AKA CARLOS GONZALES

Hacienda Heigh, CA 91745

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/21/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/21/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/21/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/14/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

7/14/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order of 07/14/2017

7/14/2017: Minute Order of 07/14/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

7/14/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Notice of Rejection

7/3/2017: Notice of Rejection

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

6/7/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

6/7/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/17/2017: Minute Order of 05/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/14/2017; Disposition Date changed from 07/14/2017 to 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/14/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Park City Air Cruise & Travel, Inc on 03/21/2017, judgment entered on 05/17/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Park City Air Cruise & Travel, Inc on 03/21/2017, judgment entered on 05/17/2017 as to Carlos Androver Gonzales is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Park City Air Cruise & Travel, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Androver Gonzales (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/30/2017; Service Cost: 63.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1170321E6604 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170321E6604 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Park City Air Cruise & Travel, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Androver Gonzales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less