This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 23:28:28 (UTC).

SPECTRUM FUNDING LLC VS MAKIYA ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 SPECTRUM FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAKIYA ANDERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2234

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRUM FUNDING LLC

6818 S. La Cienega Blvd Suite 203

Inglewood, CA 90302

Defendant

ANDERSON MAKIYA

Los Angeles, CA 90043

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/17/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

7/14/2017: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

[Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

7/14/2017: [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

6/30/2017: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

[Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

6/30/2017: [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/17/2017: Minute Order of 05/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/17/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/11/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: As to: Makiya Anderson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Makiya Anderson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Spectrum Funding LLC against Defendant Makiya Anderson on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Spectrum Funding LLC on 03/17/2017 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $2,095.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Spectrum Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Spectrum Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Makiya Anderson (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170321E7764 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170321E7764 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Spectrum Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Makiya Anderson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less