This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 00:12:03 (UTC).

FREEDOM AND FASHION VS ALPHA GRAPHICS RANCHO CUCAMONGA INC.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 FREEDOM AND FASHION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALPHA GRAPHICS RANCHO CUCAMONGA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2333

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM AND FASHION

1626 Wilcox Ave # 944

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Defendant

ALPHA GRAPHICS RANCHO CUCAMONGA INC.

9077 E. 9Th St.

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/21/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Laverne Delgado-Small

7/10/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Laverne Delgado-Small

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

7/10/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

7/10/2017: Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/10/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/10/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/10/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Laverne Delgado-Small

5/16/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Laverne Delgado-Small

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/16/2017

5/16/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/16/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/16/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/16/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 07/10/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Freedom and Fashion against Defendant Alpha Graphics Rancho Cucamonga Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Freedom and Fashion on 03/21/2017 for the principal amount of $725.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $775.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Laverne Delgado-Small; Filed by: Freedom and Fashion (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Laverne Delgado-Small; Filed by: Freedom and Fashion (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Freedom and Fashion (Plaintiff); As to: Alpha Graphics Rancho Cucamonga Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/11/17; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/16/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Freedom and Fashion (Plaintiff); As to: Alpha Graphics Rancho Cucamonga Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0010627 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less