This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 23:28:03 (UTC).

AZRA JAFRI VS HAMID ABOSSEDGH

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 AZRA JAFRI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAMID ABOSSEDGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2954

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAFRI AZRA

Downey, CA 90241

Defendants

HAMID ABOSSEDGH GERMAN-AUTO

HAMID ABOSSEDGH

South Gate, CA 90280

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

7/11/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/12/2017: Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

2/16/2018: Unknown

[Order on Request for Court Order]

2/21/2018: [Order on Request for Court Order]

[Request for Court Order and Answer]

1/23/2018: [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Unknown

12/19/2017: Unknown

[Order on Request for Court Order]

12/19/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]

Unknown

11/14/2017: Unknown

[Request for Court Order and Answer]

11/14/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]

[Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

10/10/2017: [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

Unknown

10/5/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/25/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 08/25/2017

8/25/2017: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 08/25/2017

(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

8/25/2017: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/26/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

[Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

7/28/2017: [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice of Small Claims Appeal

7/11/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/12/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Hamid Abossedgh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Azra Jafri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Hamid Abossedgh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Azra Jafri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Azra Jafri against Defendant Hamid Abossedgh on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Azra Jafri on 03/21/2017 for the principal amount of $3,000.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $3,050.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Hamid Abossedgh German-Auto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 06/09/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Azra Jafri (Plaintiff); As to: Hamid Abossedgh German-Auto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0012316 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less