This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 00:44:24 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS PINKNEY, RAMONA H

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PINKNEY, RAMONA H. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5051

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

PINKNEY RAMONA H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - EMILY PIERCE

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

PIERCE EMILY

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

3/13/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

Complaint

3/13/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

3/13/2017: Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/20/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PINKNEY, RAMONA H) ON 3/29/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

4/3/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PINKNEY, RAMONA H) ON 3/29/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

Answer

4/11/2017: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Denied

4/12/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Denied

Other - (name extension) - Civil Deposit

4/24/2017: Other - (name extension) - Civil Deposit

Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

4/24/2017: Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

Trial Brief

3/15/2018: Trial Brief

Proof of Service by Mail

3/15/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Exhibit List

3/15/2018: Exhibit List

Notice (name extension)

3/15/2018: Notice (name extension)

Witness List

3/15/2018: Witness List

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

4/24/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/24/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

9/20/2018: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 04/24/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: RAMONA H PINKNEY (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • NOTICE REQUESTING AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND TRIAL; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: RAMONA H PINKNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Trial Brief; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Exhibit List; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • Other - Civil Deposit; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES OF (PINKNEY, RAMONA H) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT HAS TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WAIVER TO POST THE PROPER FEES WITH THE CLERK`S OFFICE. A REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO THE APPLICANT. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • ANSWER FILED OF (PINKNEY, RAMONA H) . RECEIPT # F/W DENIED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PINKNEY, RAMONA H) ON 3/29/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371075. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less