This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 03:20:19 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS DICOCHEA, JAQUELINE D

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DICOCHEA, JAQUELINE D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5021

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendants

DICOCHEA JAQUELINE D

DICOCHEA JACQUELINE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF KRISTEN

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

3/13/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

Summons - Summons

3/13/2017: Summons - Summons

Complaint - Complaint

3/13/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/20/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO DICOCHEA, JACQUELINE D ON 4/1/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

4/4/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO DICOCHEA, JACQUELINE D ON 4/1/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DEC 2

1/16/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DEC 2

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

1/16/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/16/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/16/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DEC 1

1/16/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DEC 1

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

2/22/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • Updated -- Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Updated -- Jacqueline D Dicochea (Defendant): First Name changed from JAQUELINE D to Jacqueline; Last Name changed from DICOCHEA to Dicochea; Middle Name: D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC against Defendant Jacqueline D Dicochea on the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 03/13/2017 for the principal amount of $1,658.91, attorney fees of $0.00, and costs of $0.00 for a total of $1,658.91.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Updated -- Default Judgment: Result Date changed from 02/22/2019 to 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Declaration DEC 1; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Declaration DEC 2; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Default entered as to JAQUELINE D DICOCHEA; On the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • On the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 03/13/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC), does 1-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: JAQUELINE D DICOCHEA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO DICOCHEA, JACQUELINE D ON 4/1/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371050. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less