This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 11:03:56 (UTC).

RANCHO ROODS INC VS MIRANDA, SOFIA

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 RANCHO ROODS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIRANDA, SOFIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5004

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANCHO ROODS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MIRANDA SOFIA AN INDIVIDUAL DBA LA BODEGA MARKET INC

MIRANDA SOFIA DBA LA BODEGA MARKET INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLLECTION AT LAW INC., APC - JON O BLANDA ESQ

Attorney at COLLECTION AT LAW INC., APC

BLANDA JON O ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons

3/13/2017: Summons - Summons

Complaint - Complaint

3/13/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/20/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (MIRANDA, SOFIA) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (LA BODEGA MARKET INC) ON 3/25/2017

4/12/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (MIRANDA, SOFIA) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (LA BODEGA MARKET INC) ON 3/25/2017

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/14/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Entry of Judgment by Clerk

6/14/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Entry of Judgment by Clerk

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

6/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

6/14/2017: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/26/2017: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

9/20/2017: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

2/9/2018: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

3/13/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1/2/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

4/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/18/2019

4/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/18/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/18/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 04/18/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Case reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Sheryl M. Beasley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by: (RANCHO ROODS INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: (RANCHO ROODS INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 5,586.44; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MIRANDA, SOFIA) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (LA BODEGA MARKET INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MIRANDA, SOFIA) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (LA BODEGA MARKET INC) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (MIRANDA, SOFIA) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (LA BODEGA MARKET INC) ON 3/25/2017 . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371107. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (RANCHO ROODS INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less