This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 19:16:35 (UTC).

GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY VS NEWMAN, SAUNDRA

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NEWMAN, SAUNDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5003

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY

Defendant

NEWMAN SAUNDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NELSON & KENNARD - ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/18/2017: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Re: Calculation of Interest In Support of Judgment by Default by Court

6/8/2018: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Re: Calculation of Interest In Support of Judgment by Default by Court

Declaration (name extension) - Re: Military Status; CCP 1033 (b) (2)

6/8/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Re: Military Status; CCP 1033 (b) (2)

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/8/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Other - (name extension) - Contract

6/8/2018: Other - (name extension) - Contract

Judgment

7/20/2018: Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

2/28/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/28/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: SAUNDRA NEWMAN (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 3640.99; Interest: 120.78; Costs: 137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: SAUNDRA NEWMAN (Defendant); Costs: 137.00; Interest: 120.78; Service Date: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) against Defendant (NEWMAN, SAUNDRA) on the Complaint filed by GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY on 03/13/2017 for the principal amount of $2,173.38, attorney fees of $220.00, interest of $813.61, and costs of $297.00 for a total of $3,503.99.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Other - Contract; Filed by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Supplemental Declaration Re: Calculation of Interest In Support of Judgment by Default by Court; Filed by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Declaration Re: Military Status; CCP 1033 (b) (2); Filed by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: SAUNDRA NEWMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY on 03/13/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: SAUNDRA NEWMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ; Default not entered as to SAUNDRA NEWMAN; On the Complaint filed by GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY on 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (NEWMAN, SAUNDRA) ON 4/04/2017 . COSTS OF $ 72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371108. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less