This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 21:05:22 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS BRINNEY, CIARA

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRINNEY, CIARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4971

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

BRINNEY CIARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - EMILY PIERCE

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

PIERCE EMILY

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

3/13/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

Complaint

3/13/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

3/13/2017: Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/20/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BRINNEY, CIARA) ON 4/12/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

4/17/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BRINNEY, CIARA) ON 4/12/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

Declaration (name extension) - Compliance with CCP 1033(B)(2) and Waiver of Attorney Fees and Costs

8/7/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Compliance with CCP 1033(B)(2) and Waiver of Attorney Fees and Costs

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/7/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/7/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice

8/7/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Judgment

9/21/2017: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/21/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • OSC - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) against Defendant (BRINNEY, CIARA) on the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 03/13/2017 for the principal amount of $1,520.58 for a total of $1,520.58.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • On the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 03/13/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Declaration Compliance with CCP 1033(B)(2) and Waiver of Attorney Fees and Costs; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: CIARA BRINNEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Default entered as to CIARA BRINNEY; On the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC on 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BRINNEY, CIARA) ON 4/12/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371028. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less