This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 05:12:54 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS KOURI, ROBERT P

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KOURI, ROBERT P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4954

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KOURI ROBERT P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE, APC - ESTHER E HYUN

Attorney at SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE, APC

HYUN ESTHER E

Defendant Attorney

KOLLER DAVID W

 

Court Documents

Summons

3/13/2017: Summons

Complaint

3/13/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/20/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO KOURI, ROBERT P, SUB-SERVED BY LEAVING WITH LAURA CUNNINGHAM (CLERK) ON 4/28/2017 . COSTS OF $ 69.50

5/4/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO KOURI, ROBERT P, SUB-SERVED BY LEAVING WITH LAURA CUNNINGHAM (CLERK) ON 4/28/2017 . COSTS OF $ 69.50

Answer

6/12/2017: Answer

Notice (name extension) - OF TRIAL

5/16/2018: Notice (name extension) - OF TRIAL

Notice (name extension)

5/16/2018: Notice (name extension)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/29/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

5/30/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

7/19/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))

7/19/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 10/19/2018

10/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 10/19/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

10/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 03/13/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 10/19/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 10/19/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Updated -- 05/29/2018 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department B to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order (Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/19/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • Notice OF TRIAL; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT P KOURI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • NOTICE REQUESTING AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND TRIAL; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT P KOURI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • ANSWER FILED OF (KOURI, ROBERT P) . RECEIPT # NOR183318025 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 05/29/18 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO KOURI, ROBERT P, SUB-SERVED BY LEAVING WITH LAURA CUNNINGHAM (CLERK) ON 4/28/2017 . COSTS OF $ 69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371046. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (DISCOVER BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less