This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2018 at 18:41:46 (UTC).

ZHONGYI WANG VS AUTONATION ACURA SOUTH BAY

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 ZHONGYI WANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTONATION ACURA SOUTH BAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2136

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG ZHONGYI

San Gabriel, CA 91776

Defendant

AUTONATION ACURA SOUTH BAY

25341 Crenshaw Blvd

Torrance, CA 90505

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/27/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 10/27/2017

10/27/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 10/27/2017

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

10/27/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/13/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/17/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 09/01/2017

9/1/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 09/01/2017

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

9/1/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

8/2/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo)]

8/2/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo)]

Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

8/2/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/13/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/13/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/15/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/15/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/15/2017

5/15/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/15/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/15/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 10/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 10/27/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Zhongyi Wang on 03/17/2017 as follows: Defendant Autonation Acura South Bay does not owe the plaintiff Zhongyi Wang any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Zhongyi Wang on 03/17/2017, judgment entered on 07/13/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Zhongyi Wang on 03/17/2017, judgment entered on 07/13/2017 as to Autonation Acura South Bay is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/15/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Autonation Acura South Bay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Autonation Acura South Bay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Faulty: served by plaintiff; Filed by: Zhongyi Wang (Plaintiff); As to: Autonation Acura South Bay (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Zhongyi Wang (Plaintiff); As to: Autonation Acura South Bay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010821 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less