This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:31:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUDNING LLC VS HERNANDEZ, FELIPA

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 LVNV FUDNING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, FELIPA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4754

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUDNING LLC

Defendant

HERNANDEZ FELIPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE - LORI BRODBECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE

BRODBECK LORI

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/11/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

1/11/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF INTEREST EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES

1/11/2018: Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF INTEREST EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration (name extension) - NON-MILITARY STATUS

1/11/2018: Declaration (name extension) - NON-MILITARY STATUS

Declaration (name extension) - 1033 B (1) & (2)

1/11/2018: Declaration (name extension) - 1033 B (1) & (2)

Judgment

2/21/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Military Status

11/30/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Military Status

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/30/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Declaration of Non-Military Status; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: FELIPA HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUDNING LLC) against Defendant (HERNANDEZ, FELIPA) on the Complaint filed by LVNV FUDNING LLC on 03/09/2017 for the principal amount of $820.91 and costs of $294.50 for a total of $1,115.41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Declaration NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: FELIPA HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Default entered as to FELIPA HERNANDEZ; On the Complaint filed by LVNV FUDNING LLC on 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by LVNV FUDNING LLC on 03/09/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Declaration WAIVER OF INTEREST EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Declaration 1033 B (1) & (2); Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HERNANDEZ, FELIPA) 3/28/2017 . COSTS OF $ 69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR624914185. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less