This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:20:53 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK VS SANCHEZ, MARTIN

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANCHEZ, MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4749

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK

Defendant

SANCHEZ MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REESE LAW GROUP - JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP

PLEASANT JOSEPH M ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

3/9/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Summons - Summons

3/9/2017: Summons - Summons

Complaint - Complaint

3/9/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO SANCHEZ, MARTIN SUB-SERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE (CO-OCCUPANT) ON 4/

4/10/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO SANCHEZ, MARTIN SUB-SERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE (CO-OCCUPANT) ON 4/

Declaration (name extension)

9/27/2017: Declaration (name extension)

Declaration (name extension)

9/27/2017: Declaration (name extension)

Application (name extension)

9/27/2017: Application (name extension)

Order (name extension)

10/5/2017: Order (name extension)

Proof of Publication

12/18/2017: Proof of Publication

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/1/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT

12/19/2018: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT

Order (name extension) - Order ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/19/2018: Order (name extension) - Order ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Updated -- Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT: Filed By: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Order ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Updated -- Order ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT: Filed By: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Default entered as to MARTIN SANCHEZ; On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK on 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN SANCHEZ (Defendant); Service Costs Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • ORDER RE: PUBLICATION; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF JENNY R. LOURO, ESQ, IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO SANCHEZ, MARTIN SUB-SERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE (CO-OCCUPANT) ON 4/5/17 . COSTS OF $ 79.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR624914180. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Declaration of Venue; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less