This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 10:15:40 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS HOWARD, ERIKA

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOWARD, ERIKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4673

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HOWARD ERIKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE - LORI BRODBECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE

BRODBECK LORI

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/20/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/20/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 b (1) & (2)

9/20/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 b (1) & (2)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES

9/20/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 10/25/2018 entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (HOWARD, ERIKA).

10/31/2018: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 10/25/2018 entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (HOWARD, ERIKA).

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/18/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

1/18/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

1/22/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: ERIKA HOWARD (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 1094.90; Interest: 25.20; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: ERIKA HOWARD (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 25.00; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 10/25/2018 entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (HOWARD, ERIKA). Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (HOWARD, ERIKA) on the Complaint filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 03/09/2017 for the principal amount of $800.40 and costs of $294.50 for a total of $1,094.90.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 b (1) & (2); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 03/09/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (LVNV FUNDING LLC), does 1 to 5, inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 to 5, inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Declaration PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: ERIKA HOWARD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Default entered as to ERIKA HOWARD; On the Complaint filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (HOWARD, ERIKA) ON 3/28/2017 . COSTS OF $ 69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371022. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less