This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 20:13:26 (UTC).

LVNV FUDNING LLC VS CHACON, MARIO

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 LVNV FUDNING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHACON, MARIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4669

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUDNING LLC

Defendant

CHACON MARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE - LORI BRODBECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE

BRODBECK LORI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/9/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

3/9/2017: Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Granted

4/17/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Granted

General Denial

4/17/2017: General Denial

Motion re: (name extension) - DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED (C.C.P. SECTION 2033.280) BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

7/3/2017: Motion re: (name extension) - DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED (C.C.P. SECTION 2033.280) BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

Notice (name extension) - OF SUBMISSION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION DEEMING REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

7/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - OF SUBMISSION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION DEEMING REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

8/9/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted) of 08/09/2017 and Order Deeming Requests for Admissions as Admitted

8/9/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted) of 08/09/2017 and Order Deeming Requests for Admissions as Admitted

Order (name extension) - Deeming Requests for Admissions as Admitted

8/9/2017: Order (name extension) - Deeming Requests for Admissions as Admitted

Notice (name extension) - of submission on Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

8/23/2017: Notice (name extension) - of submission on Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

8/23/2017: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Judgment

11/20/2017: Judgment

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

11/20/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

Order (name extension) - motion for judgment on the pleadings

11/20/2017: Order (name extension) - motion for judgment on the pleadings

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/19/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension)

3/19/2018: Declaration (name extension)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 23,604.13; Interest: 737.22; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO CHACON (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 737.22; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled for 11/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 11/20/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUDNING LLC) against Defendant (CHACON, MARIO) on the Complaint filed by (LVNV FUDNING LLC) on 03/09/2017 for the principal amount of $23,189.63 and costs of $414.50 for a total of $23,604.13.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION DEEMING REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (CHACON, MARIO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED OF (CHACON, MARIO) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 04/17/18 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CHACON, MARIO) 3/28/2017 . COSTS OF $ 69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371004. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (LVNV FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less