This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:53:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS HILARIO, AMADEO

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HILARIO, AMADEO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4356

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIDLAND FUNDINGLLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANKN.A.

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N. A.

Defendant

HILARIO AMADEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP. - BRIAN N. WINN

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

WINN BRIAN N.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - memorandum of case in support of request for judgment

10/23/2017: Declaration (name extension) - memorandum of case in support of request for judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/23/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

10/23/2017: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice - and supplemental reference memorandum of comparison exhibits

10/23/2017: Request for Judicial Notice - and supplemental reference memorandum of comparison exhibits

Declaration (name extension) - of Molly Kampa in support of judgment

10/23/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Molly Kampa in support of judgment

Declaration (name extension) - in support of judgment ccp 1033

10/23/2017: Declaration (name extension) - in support of judgment ccp 1033

Judgment

12/22/2017: Judgment

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Unsatisfied)

9/20/2018: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Unsatisfied)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • Updated -- Writ - Return (Unsatisfied): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Writ - Return (Unsatisfied) ( ); Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 5,044.43; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (MIDLAND FUNDING) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. against Defendant (HILARIO, AMADEO) on the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING on 03/16/2017 for the principal amount of $4,759.43 and costs of $285.00 for a total of $5,044.43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Request for Judicial Notice and supplemental reference memorandum of comparison exhibits; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: AMADEO HILARIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • On the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING on 03/16/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Declaration in support of judgment ccp 1033; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Declaration memorandum of case in support of request for judgment; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Declaration of Molly Kampa in support of judgment; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS: COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (HILARIO, AMADEO) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH BETSY DUARTE ON 3/30/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/02/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR508390017. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less