This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 02:26:14 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I VS OGUNNAIKE, VERONICA O

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 CAVALRY SPV I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OGUNNAIKE, VERONICA O. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4355

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV ILLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANKN.A.

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N. A.

Defendant

OGUNNAIKE VERONICA O AKA OGUNNAIKE VERONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP. - BRIAN N. WINN

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

WINN BRIAN N.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons

3/16/2017: Summons - Summons

Complaint - Complaint

3/16/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/17/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Not Found

5/8/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Not Found

Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/12/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration (name extension) - in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Publication of Summons on Defendant

7/10/2018: Declaration (name extension) - in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Publication of Summons on Defendant

Application for Order to Publish

7/10/2018: Application for Order to Publish

Order (name extension) - Granting Plaintiff's Application for Publication of Summons on Defendant

7/17/2018: Order (name extension) - Granting Plaintiff's Application for Publication of Summons on Defendant

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

10/1/2018: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

3/11/2019: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/11/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 1788.60

3/11/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 1788.60

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Original Documents

3/11/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Original Documents

Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Case in Support of Request for Judgment

3/11/2019: Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Case in Support of Request for Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

3/11/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/21/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: VERONICA O OGUNNAIKE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. against Defendant (OGUNNAIKE, VERONICA O) AKA (OGUNNAIKE, VERONICA) on the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I on 03/16/2017 for the principal amount of $15,843.42 and costs of $920.00 for a total of $16,763.42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: VERONICA O OGUNNAIKE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Declaration re: 1788.60; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Declaration re: Original Documents; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: VERONICA O OGUNNAIKE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Case in Support of Request for Judgment; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for Publication of Summons on Defendant; Signed and Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Application for Order to Publish; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Publication of Summons on Defendant; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff); As to: VERONICA O OGUNNAIKE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (OGUNNAIKE, VERONICA O) AKA (OGUNNAIKE, VERONICA) FILED. COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/02/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR508390016. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (CAVALRY SPV I) LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK) N. A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less