This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 21:20:02 (UTC).

FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION VS ALVARADO, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALVARADO, KEVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4352

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ALVARADO KEVIN AN INDIVIDUAL

ALVARADO KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PRENOVOST, NORMANDIN, BERGH & DAWE - THOMAS J. PRENOVOST JR.

Attorney at PRENOVOST, NORMANDIN, BERGH & DAWE

PRENOVOST THOMAS J. JR.

Defendant Attorney

BUTLER AIDAN W.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/16/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALVARADO, KEVIN) AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH IRIDIAN GOMEZ ON 3/20/2017 . COSTS OF $

3/24/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALVARADO, KEVIN) AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH IRIDIAN GOMEZ ON 3/20/2017 . COSTS OF $

Answer

4/13/2017: Answer

Notice of Trial

4/13/2017: Notice of Trial

Declaration (name extension) - of Benjamin K. Griffin In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for Summary Adjudication of Issues

7/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Benjamin K. Griffin In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for Summary Adjudication of Issues

Motion for Summary Judgment - and Alternatively for Summary Adjudication of Issues; Memorandum of points and Authorities in Support

7/14/2017: Motion for Summary Judgment - and Alternatively for Summary Adjudication of Issues; Memorandum of points and Authorities in Support

Separate Statement - of Disputed Facts and Supporting Evidence

9/22/2017: Separate Statement - of Disputed Facts and Supporting Evidence

Opposition (name extension) - to Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication; Supporting Declarations of Aidan Butler and Levin Alvarado

9/22/2017: Opposition (name extension) - to Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication; Supporting Declarations of Aidan Butler and Levin Alvarado

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for ...)

10/5/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for ...)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for ...)

10/5/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for ...)

Declaration (name extension) - of Benjamin K. Griffin in Support of Opposition to Motion to Vacate

3/7/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Benjamin K. Griffin in Support of Opposition to Motion to Vacate

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/12/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - of Ruling

4/12/2018: Notice (name extension) - of Ruling

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation for Judgment: Order Thereon

4/12/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation for Judgment: Order Thereon

Request for Dismissal

4/12/2018: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

5/3/2018: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

6/22/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: (FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims RECEIVED 5 ABSTRACTS; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Stipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff (FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION against Defendant (ALVARADO, KEVIN) AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION on 03/16/2017 for the principal amount of $14,909.97, attorney fees of $7,121.50, interest of $1,621.90, and costs of $1,286.00 for a total of $24,939.37.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 04/12/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 through 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION on 03/16/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 through 20

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • Declaration of Benjamin K. Griffin In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternatively for Summary Adjudication of Issues; Filed by: (FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ALVARADO, KEVIN) AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # NOR183318004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 04/12/18 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Notice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALVARADO, KEVIN) AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH IRIDIAN GOMEZ ON 3/20/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR183318012. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/02/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (FIRST CITY CREDIT UNION) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less