This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 07:52:40 (UTC).

TBF FINANCIAL I LLC VS MARCHENA, JESUS

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 TBF FINANCIAL I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARCHENA, JESUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4350

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TBF FINANCIAL I LLC

Defendants

MARCHENA JESUS AN INDIVIDUAL AKA MARCHENA. JESUS JESSE

MARCHENA JESUS AKA MARCHENA. JESUS JESSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM - JOHN D. GUERRINI

Attorney at THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

GUERRINI JOHN D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/12/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/12/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/12/2017: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

9/12/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Other - (name extension)

9/12/2017: Other - (name extension)

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

9/12/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

11/17/2017: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Judgment

2/26/2018: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

3/23/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

3/23/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/10/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/30/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/30/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: JOHN D. GUERRINI (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I LLC) (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: GABA GUERRINI LAW CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Updated -- JOHN D. GUERRINI (Attorney): Organization Name changed from THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM to GABA GUERRINI LAW CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Address for JOHN D. GUERRINI (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 5,231.68; Interest: 254.54; Costs: 5,511.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: JESUS MARCHENA (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 254.54; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 08/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: JESUS MARCHENA (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • Default entered as to JESUS MARCHENA; On the Complaint filed by TBF FINANCIAL I LLC on 03/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MARCHENA, JESUS) AN INDIVIDUAL AKA (MARCHENA. JESUS JESSE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MARCHENA, JESUS) AN INDIVIDUAL AKA (MARCHENA. JESUS JESSE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (MARCHENA, JESUS) AN INDIVIDUAL AKA (MARCHENA. JESUS JESSE) ON 3/31/2017 . COSTS OF $ 82.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (TBF FINANCIAL I LLC) FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE; DOCUMENT ALREADY FILED WITH THE COURT ON 4/4/2017 SUBMITTED ON 04/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR183318013. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/28/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less