This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2019 at 05:03:14 (UTC).

KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC VS LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4343

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC

Defendants

LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED DBALANDMARK BUILDERS

LANDMARK BUILDERS

LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED DBA LANDMARK BUILDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GABA LAW CORPORATION - RUDY GABA JR.

Attorney at GABA LAW CORPORATION

GABA JR. RUDY

Defendant Attorney

ELLIS RONALD D

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/8/2017: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2017: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2017: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

11/21/2017: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Declaration of Mailing

12/19/2017: Declaration of Mailing

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/19/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Request for Dismissal

12/29/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Underlying Action For Open Book Account

12/29/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Underlying Action For Open Book Account

Declaration (name extension) - Calculation Of Accrued Interest

12/29/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Calculation Of Accrued Interest

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/29/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Attorney's Fees

12/29/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Attorney's Fees

Judgment

1/22/2018: Judgment

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/1/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketAddress for RUDY GABA JR. (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: RUDY GABA JR. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) against Defendant LANDMARK BUILDERS on the Complaint filed by (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) on 03/15/2017 for the principal amount of $10,100.67, attorney fees of $693.02, interest of $1,573.36, and costs of $449.00 for a total of $12,816.05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Attorney's Fees; Filed by: (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Calculation Of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Underlying Action For Open Book Account; Filed by: (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) on 03/15/2017, Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to (LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (KINGSPAN INSULATED PANELS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: (LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: (LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED) (Defendant); Type: Fictitious Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED) DBA(LANDMARK BUILDERS) . RECEIPT # NOR183318017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 04/24/18 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (LUCAS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED) DBA(LANDMARK BUILDERS) SRV DAN MARTINEZ (AGT) SBSRV ELVIRA TORRES ON 3/22/17 . COSTS OF $ 79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR183318004. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/28/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less