This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 02:10:38 (UTC).

TBF FINANCIAL I VS KREIMANN, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 TBF FINANCIAL I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KREIMANN, RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4340

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TBF FINANCIAL ILLC

TBF FINANCIAL I LLC

Defendants

KREIMANN RICHARD AN INDIVIDUAL AKA KREIMAN RICHARD F AKA KREIMAN RI

KREIMANN RICHARD AKA KREIMAN RICHARD F AKA KREIMAN RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM - JOHN D. GUERRINI

Attorney at THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

GUERRINI JOHN D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/20/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/7/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/7/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

9/7/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - Summary of Case

9/7/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Summary of Case

Request for Dismissal

9/7/2017: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

11/30/2017: Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

1/10/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Entry of Judgment

1/10/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD KREIMANN (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC against Defendant (KREIMANN, RICHARD) AN INDIVIDUAL AKA (KREIMAN, RICHARD F), AKA (KREIMAN, RICHARD) on the Complaint filed by (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC on 03/14/2017 for the principal amount of $4,083.34, attorney fees of $335.00, interest of $372.96, and costs of $389.00 for a total of $5,180.30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD KREIMANN (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD KREIMANN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Default entered as to RICHARD KREIMANN; On the Complaint filed by (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC on 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • On the Complaint filed by (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC on 03/14/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Declaration Summary of Case; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Default entered as to RICHARD KREIMANN; On the Complaint filed by (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC on 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (TBF FINANCIAL I) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD KREIMANN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (KREIMANN, RICHARD) AN INDIVIDUAL AKA (KREIMAN, RICHARD F) AKA (KREIMAN, RICHARD) ON 5/3/2017 . COSTS OF $ 164.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR508390019. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/27/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less