This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 10:18:39 (UTC).

MANIFEST VS BRIKK

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 MANIFEST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIKK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4339

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANIFESTLLC

MANIFEST LLC

Defendants

BRIKKLLC

BRIKK LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PROBER & RAPHAEL, A LAW CORPORATION - DEAN PROBER

Attorney at PROBER & RAPHAEL, A LAW CORPORATION

PROBER DEAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/14/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

3/14/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons

3/14/2017: Summons - Summons

Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BRIKK)LLC SRV SAID BIRGEOGLU (AGT) SBSRV ESPIE DOE ON 3/24/2017 . COST

3/30/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BRIKK)LLC SRV SAID BIRGEOGLU (AGT) SBSRV ESPIE DOE ON 3/24/2017 . COST

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/15/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

10/19/2017: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

12/11/2017: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/11/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

12/11/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: ACCRUED INTEREST

4/16/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: ACCRUED INTEREST

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/16/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment

6/14/2018: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

7/18/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Said Birgeoglu

1/3/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Said Birgeoglu

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination as to Said Birgeoglu scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination as to Said Birgeoglu scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Said Birgeoglu; Filed by: (MANIFEST) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: (BRIKK) LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: (MANIFEST) LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (BRIKK)LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BRIKK)LLC . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BRIKK)LLC SRV SAID BIRGEOGLU (AGT) SBSRV ESPIE DOE ON 3/24/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR508390018. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/27/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (MANIFEST) LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less