This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 12:40:09 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY VS IVAN BIG TREE

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IVAN BIG TREE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4338

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERYINC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A BLAIR SM

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RIOS JORGE A/K/A RIOS JORGE F. A/K/A RIOS JORGE FRANCISCO A/K/A T

IVAN BIG TREELLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

IVAN BIG TREE LLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RIOS JORGE

Cross Defendants

FLORES JESUS F.

FLORES ALBERTO FAUSTO

A&F DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - GLENN A. BESNYL

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

BESNYL GLENN A.

Defendant Attorney

OSUNA CLAUDIA CECILIA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/14/2017: Complaint

Summons

3/14/2017: Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/14/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (IVAN BIG TREE)LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SRVD RIOS, JORGE FRANCISCO(AGENT), SBSRVD R

4/11/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (IVAN BIG TREE)LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SRVD RIOS, JORGE FRANCISCO(AGENT), SBSRVD R

Answer

4/14/2017: Answer

Ex Parte Application (name extension)

4/12/2018: Ex Parte Application (name extension)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MOTIO...)

4/12/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MOTIO...)

Substitution of Attorney

4/12/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration (name extension) - OF EX PARTE NOTICE

8/7/2018: Declaration (name extension) - OF EX PARTE NOTICE

Summons - on Cross Complaint

8/7/2018: Summons - on Cross Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - as to Alberto Fausto Flores

8/28/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - as to Alberto Fausto Flores

Declaration of Mailing

9/5/2018: Declaration of Mailing

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

9/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration re: Due Diligence

9/5/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence

9/5/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • Updated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department B to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY) INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A (BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (IVAN BIG TREE) LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (IVAN BIG TREE) LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Cross-Complainant); As to: JESUS F. FLORES (Cross-Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/22/18; Service Cost: 44.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: (IVAN BIG TREE) LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Cross-Complainant); As to: JESUS F. FLORES (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: (IVAN BIG TREE) LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (IVAN BIG TREE) LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Cross-Complainant); As to: ALBERTO FAUSTO FLORES (Cross-Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/22/18; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2017
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (RIOS, JORGE) A/K/A (RIOS, JORGE F.) A/K/A (RIOS, JORGE FRANCISCO) A/K/A (TRASANCOS, JORGE) A/K/A (TRASANCOS, JORGE F. RIOS) A/K/A (TRASANCOS, JORGE RIOS) A/K/A (RIOS, FRANCISCO) A/K/A IN THE SUM OF $ 8.25 FOR RECEIVED FAX FILING OF ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT . RECEIPT # NOR244539002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (IVAN BIG TREE)LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY IN THE SUM OF $ 8.25 FOR RECEIVED FAX FILING OF ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT . RECEIPT # NOR244539003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • ANSWER FILED OF (IVAN BIG TREE)LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . RECEIPT # NOR244539003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (IVAN BIG TREE)LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SRVD RIOS, JORGE FRANCISCO(AGENT), SBSRVD RIOS, IMELDA(SSTR) . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO RIOS, JORGE, SBSRVED BY LEAVING WITH RIOS, IMELDA (SISTER) ON 03/31/17 . COSTS OF $ 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR508390017. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/27/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY) INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A (BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less