This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 01:00:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BAN VS BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4337

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANKA UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK

Defendants

BENKIRANE NAOUFALAN INDIVIDUAL

BENKIRANE NAOUFAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICAEL & ASSOCIATES - LINA M MICHAEL

Attorney at MICAEL & ASSOCIATES

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/14/2017: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/14/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL)AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE ON 4/06/2017 . COSTS OF $ 10

4/11/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL)AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE ON 4/06/2017 . COSTS OF $ 10

Answer

6/5/2017: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Granted

6/5/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Granted

Motion re: (name extension) - to Deem Matters Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions

2/6/2018: Motion re: (name extension) - to Deem Matters Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions

Order (name extension) - DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AD FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS.

3/7/2018: Order (name extension) - DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AD FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS.

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deem Matters Admitted and for Mo...)

3/7/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deem Matters Admitted and for Mo...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deem Matters Admitted and for Mo...) of 03/07/2018

3/7/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deem Matters Admitted and for Mo...) of 03/07/2018

Notice of Ruling

3/19/2018: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - In Re: Declaration of Robert J. Rebhan in Lieu of Testimony

4/11/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - In Re: Declaration of Robert J. Rebhan in Lieu of Testimony

Witness List

5/17/2018: Witness List

Trial Brief

5/17/2018: Trial Brief

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

5/17/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

5/25/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

5/25/2018: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

Judgment

5/25/2018: Judgment

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 11,364.59; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Exhibit List and Declaration of Robert J. Rebhan in Lieu of Testimony (CCP 98); Filed by: (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Updated -- (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) , A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK to (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) , A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL)AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL)AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL)AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # PENDING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • REQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL)AN INDIVIDUAL FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT SEF FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BENKIRANE, NAOUFAL)AN INDIVIDUAL SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH JANE DOE ON 4/06/2017 . COSTS OF $ 107.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR508390016. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/27/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less