This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 09:34:25 (UTC).

AURELIE MARIE CAO VS NICK SMITH

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 AURELIE MARIE CAO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NICK SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2115

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAO AURELIE MARIE

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Defendant

SMITH NICK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/11/2017

5/11/2017: Minute Order of 05/11/2017

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/14/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/11/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/11/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Aurelie Marie Cao (Plaintiff); As to: Nick Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0010318 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.