This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 22:33:52 (UTC).

CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI VS NICHOLE C. CALDERA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NICHOLE C CALDERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH A. ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0436

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI

38713 Tierra Subida #200-313

Palmdale, CA 93551

Defendant

CALDERA NICHOLE C.

Palmdale, CA 93551

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/22/2018: Unknown

(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

4/24/2018: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/24/2018

4/24/2018: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/24/2018

(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

2/22/2018: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Unknown

1/24/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/4/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/14/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/24/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/24/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 04/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/24/2017: Minute Order of 04/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/24/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 02/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 04/24/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 02/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI (Plaintiff); As to: NICHOLE C. CALDERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 04/24/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI against Defendant NICHOLE C. CALDERA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI on 03/14/2017 for the principal amount of $1,050.00, interest of $318.90, and costs of $95.00 for a total of $1,463.90.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI (Plaintiff); As to: NICHOLE C. CALDERA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/01/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES MITSUBISHI (Plaintiff); As to: NICHOLE C. CALDERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002254 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Randolph A. Rogers at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    Read MoreRead Less