HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:13:19

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Surendra Deoram against Concrete Marble Transformerz Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2334
  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Concrete & Marble Transformerz Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Deoram Surendra
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/25/2017: Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
7/12/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
RETURNED MAIL Not Deliverable
10/10/2017: RETURNED MAIL Not Deliverable
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended...
4/4/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/25/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/24/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL RETURNED MAIL Not Deliverable; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Concrete & Marble Transformerz, Inc (Defendant)
  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/07/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 779.00
  • 07/12/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Surendra Deoram against Defendant Concrete & Marble Transformerz, Inc on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Surendra Deoram on 03/07/2017 for the principal amount of $650.00 and costs of $129.00 for a total of $779.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.
  • 05/24/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Concrete & Marble Transformerz, Inc (Defendant)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/24/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 04/04/2017
  • Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Surendra Deoram (Plaintiff); As to: Concrete & Marble Transformerz, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/09/2017; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Surendra Deoram (Plaintiff); As to: Concrete & Marble Transformerz, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/09/2017; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Surendra Deoram (Plaintiff); As to: Concrete & Marble Transformerz, Inc (Defendant)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011746 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --