HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:21:39

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Juan Carlos Uribe against Mireya Meza in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2333
  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Uribe Juan Carlos
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Meza Mireya Dba Safe & E-z Tax Services Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/18/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: JUAN CARLOS URIBE (Plaintiff)
  • 05/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/18/2017
  • 05/18/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JUAN CARLOS URIBE (Plaintiff); As to: MIREYA MEZA (Defendant)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011745 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --