HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:21:35

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Cathy Mitchell against In-n-out Burger Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2332
  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mitchell Cathy
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    In-n-out Burger Corporation Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)...
5/25/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/22/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/19/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/24/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/7/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/24/2017
5/24/2017: Minute Order of 05/24/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/24/2017
5/24/2017: Minute Order of 05/24/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Court Order)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/24/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/24/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/24/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/24/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/24/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: In-N-Out Burger Corporation (Defendant)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/24/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: In-N-Out Burger Corporation (Defendant)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Amount: $10.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0014828 (Check)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 05/22/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: In-N-Out Burger Corporation (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 05/19/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Cathy Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: In-N-Out Burger Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/18/2017
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cathy Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: In-N-Out Burger Corporation (Defendant)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 03/07/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cathy Mitchell (Plaintiff)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011744 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --