HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:13:16

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Computer 1 Products Of America Inc against Mywi Fabricators Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2330
  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Computer 1 Products Of America Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Mywi Fabricators Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
7/13/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Free
Download
by Jeanne Yue
9/12/2017: by Jeanne Yue
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Rejection]
10/10/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings
5/5/2017: Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
7/13/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/29/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Motion for Change of Venue
4/3/2017: Motion for Change of Venue
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
6/29/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/29/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/29/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Computer 1 Products of America, Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 10/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 09/22/2017
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90 effective 09/22/2017; Reason:
  • 09/22/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/21/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department NE2
  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 09/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 09/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/12/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 09/12/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Julius Argumedo; Filed by: Computer 1 Products of America, Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 09/12/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jeanne Yue; Filed by: MYWI Fabricators, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 07/13/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: MYWI Fabricators, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 07/13/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0015053 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/13/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 07/13/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/13/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0015053
  • 07/13/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0015069 (Credit Card)
  • 06/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/29/2017
  • Updated -- Motion for Change of Venue: Result: Result Date: 06/29/2017
  • 06/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/29/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 06/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --