HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:13:12

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Lisa Gwynn-tender against Verenice Ramirez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2329
  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Gwynn-tender Lisa
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Ramirez Verenice Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/26/2017: Minute Order of 05/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
6/26/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Free
Download
Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
7/14/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/9/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/7/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
6/26/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/26/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
8/4/2017: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 08/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/14/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Verenice Ramirez (Defendant)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016272 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/26/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Lisa Gwynn-Tender against Defendant Verenice Ramirez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lisa Gwynn-Tender on 03/07/2017 for the principal amount of $500.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $590.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/25/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 05/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Verenice Ramirez (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 05/04/2017
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lisa Gwynn-Tender (Plaintiff); As to: Verenice Ramirez (Defendant)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 03/07/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lisa Gwynn-Tender (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --