HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:13:06

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Maria Angelica Castro against Margarita Frayde in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2323
  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Frayde Margarita Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Castro Maria Angelica
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Frayde Agustin Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Frayde Margarita
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Castro Maria Angelica
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
7/12/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/7/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/25/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/25/2017
5/25/2017: Minute Order of 05/25/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
5/9/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/12/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/25/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Maria Angelica Castro on 03/07/2017: Defendants Agustin Frayde; Margarita Frayde do not owe the plaintiff Maria Angelica Castro any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/25/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Margarita Frayde on 05/09/2017: Plaintiff Maria Angelica Castro does not owe the defendant Margarita Frayde any money on defendant's claim. Other: Ms. Castro owed three months of water bills (over $200.00) and rent for at least three days of February (at least $140.00). Those charges, plus damages and cleaning, exceeded the $500.00. EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN
  • 05/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Margarita Frayde (Defendant); As to: Maria Angelica Castro (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/09/2017
  • 05/09/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0014267 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/09/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Margarita Frayde (Defendant); As to: Maria Angelica Castro (Plaintiff)
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Agustin Frayde (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/20/2017
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Margarita Frayde (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/20/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria Angelica Castro (Plaintiff); As to: Margarita Frayde (Defendant); Agustin Frayde (Defendant)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 03/07/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria Angelica Castro (Plaintiff)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011706 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --