HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:13:03

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Hollywood Sunset Pictures against Liz Miles in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2322
  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Hollywood Sunset Pictures
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Spinoso Joe
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Miles Liz Aka Elizabeth Miles Dba Miles Away Graphics Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2017 and Ju...
8/9/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2017 and Ju...
  Free
Download
Unknown
8/9/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
10/3/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/9/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/28/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/7/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/15/2017
5/15/2017: Minute Order of 05/15/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/15/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/15/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/9/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: HOLLYWOOD SUNSET PICTURES (Plaintiff); JOE SPINOSO (Plaintiff); As to: LIZ MILES (Defendant)
  • 10/03/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 12/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 08/09/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: HOLLYWOOD SUNSET PICTURES (Plaintiff)
  • 08/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/09/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/09/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/09/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff JOE SPINOSO and Plaintiff HOLLYWOOD SUNSET PICTURES against Defendant LIZ MILES AKA ELIZABETH MILES, DBA MILES AWAY GRAPHICS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by HOLLYWOOD SUNSET PICTURES, et al. on 03/07/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $5,080.00.
  • 05/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued to 08/09/2017
  • 05/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 05/15/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Amount: $10.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0014444 (Cash)
  • 05/15/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: HOLLYWOOD SUNSET PICTURES (Plaintiff)
  • 05/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/15/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/15/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/15/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 03/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HOLLYWOOD SUNSET PICTURES (Plaintiff); As to: LIZ MILES (Defendant); Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/15/2017
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: HOLLYWOOD SUNSET PICTURES (Plaintiff); JOE SPINOSO (Plaintiff); As to: LIZ MILES (Defendant)
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011705 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --