HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:20:32

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc Fka Progress Financial Corp against Eduardo Castro Garcia in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2315
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Castro Garcia Eduardo Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Oportun Inc. Fka Progress Financial Corp.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/2/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/15/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/15/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Castro Garcia (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/10/2017
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170306E2801 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170306E2801 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Castro Garcia (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --