HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:12:53

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Nasreen Taylor against Jocelyn Jhong in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2297
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Taylor Nasreen
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Jhong Jocelyn Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Jhong Jocelyn Jae Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/11/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/28/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/21/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/6/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/11/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/29/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/29/2017
6/29/2017: Minute Order of 06/29/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
6/29/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/29/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/29/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/29/2017
  • 06/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 06/29/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 06/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 06/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/29/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/29/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Nasreen Taylor on 03/21/2017: Defendant Jocelyn Jae Jhong does not owe the plaintiff Nasreen Taylor any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Plaintiff failed to sustain the requisite burden of proof to prove intent re retaliation. Mutual agreement signed and Plaintiff failed to produce evidence proving her alleged out of pocket expenses. Plaintiff withheld information and Defendant was able to prove no retaliation.
  • 04/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/29/2017
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Jocelyn Jae Jhong (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 04/11/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0013123 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/11/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 03/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Jocelyn Jae Jhong (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/23/2017
  • 03/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/21/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nasreen Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: Jocelyn Jae Jhong (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nasreen Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: Jocelyn Jhong (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 03/06/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Nasreen Taylor (Plaintiff)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011669 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --