HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:19:09

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Sanjay Mani against Willie Christor in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2292
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Christor Willie Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Mani Sanjay
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/24/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/7/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
6/22/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/6/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/24/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/24/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/24/2017: Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/29/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/29/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/24/2017 to 08/29/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 08/24/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: SANJAY MANI (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE CHRISTOR (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: SANJAY MANI (Plaintiff)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/30/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011662
  • 05/30/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0015031 (Cash)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff SANJAY MANI against Defendant WILLIE CHRISTOR on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SANJAY MANI on 03/06/2017 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $59.00 for a total of $2,059.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $75.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant WILLIE CHRISTOR. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 03/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SANJAY MANI (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE CHRISTOR (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/15/2017; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SANJAY MANI (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE CHRISTOR (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 03/06/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: SANJAY MANI (Plaintiff)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011662 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --