HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:18:58

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by American Auto Financing Inc against David Garcia Estrada in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2289
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    American Auto Financing Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Estrada David Garcia Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/2/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/7/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/30/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/3/2017: Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
8/7/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application and Order to Produce Statement of Asse...
7/5/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Asse...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance a...
8/7/2017: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance a...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: American Auto Financing Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 08/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 08/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 08/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/07/2017
  • , Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department SE2 Held - Continued to 10/16/2017 01:30 PM at 10/16/2017 1:30 PM Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination in Department SE2
  • 08/07/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: American Auto Financing Inc (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID GARCIA ESTRADA (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/03/2017
  • 07/05/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 07/05/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued by: Clerk; As to: DAVID GARCIA ESTRADA (Defendant)
  • 07/05/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016615 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/05/2017
  • Trust Deposit: Over Payment; Amount: $40.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016615 (Check); Party: American Auto Financing Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 07/05/2017
  • Payment: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Amount: $60.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016615
  • 07/05/2017
  • Payment: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Amount: $60.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016663 (Check)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff American Auto Financing Inc against Defendant DAVID GARCIA ESTRADA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by American Auto Financing Inc on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,615.00.
  • 05/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: American Auto Financing Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: American Auto Financing Inc (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID GARCIA ESTRADA (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/22/2017
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011655 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --