HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:18:46

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Gonzalo Santa Maria in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2286
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Don Roberto Jewelers Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Santa Maria Gonzalo Aka Gonzalo Santamaria Sanchez Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Vargas Mirella Aka Mirella Ivonne Vargas-munoz Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/21/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/14/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/14/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ON OR...
7/26/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ON O...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/1/2017: Minute Order of 06/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
8/21/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order fo...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application and Order to Produce Statement of Asse...
7/10/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Ass...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance a...
8/21/2017: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 08/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 08/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 08/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/21/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) ON ORAP; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: GONZALO SANTA MARIA (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/22/2017
  • 07/10/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 07/10/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued by: Clerk; As to: GONZALO SANTA MARIA (Defendant)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016834 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 06/01/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Defendant MIRELLA VARGAS AKA MIRELLA IVONNE VARGAS-MUNOZ; Defendant GONZALO SANTA MARIA AKA GONZALO SANTAMARIA SANCHEZ on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 03/06/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $130.00 for a total of $2,630.00, joint and several.
  • 06/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 06/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/01/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/14/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: MIRELLA VARGAS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/09/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/14/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: GONZALO SANTA MARIA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/09/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: GONZALO SANTA MARIA (Defendant); MIRELLA VARGAS (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011647 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --