HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:18:42

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Fox Global Logistics Corporation against Michael E Lekawa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2285
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Fox Global Logistics Corporation
  • Represented By:

    • Lemoine Jessica Lille
  • Defendant

    Lekawa Michael E. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Lemoine Jessica Lille
  • Represented By:

    • Plain
  • Undetermined

    L.a. Commercial Group Inc. A Corporation Dba Continental Commercial Group
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Assignee

    L.a. Commercial Group Inc. A Corporation Dba Continental Commercial Group
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - (Orange)
7/20/2017: Writ of Execution - (Orange)
  Fees Apply
Download
Substitution of Attorney
7/20/2017: Substitution of Attorney
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment...
7/20/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgmen...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
3/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/23/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
Assignment of Judgment
7/20/2017: Assignment of Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. a Corporation, dba Continental Commercial Group (Assignee): Organization Name changed from Jessica L. Lemoine, SBN 128567 to L.A. Commercial Group, Inc. a Corporation, dba Continental Commercial Group
  • 07/21/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;
  • 07/21/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0017288 (Check)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;
  • 07/21/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0017289 (Check)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: Jessica L. Lemoine, SBN 128567 (Assignee); As to: FOX GLOBAL LOGISTICS CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by:
  • 07/20/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
  • 07/20/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Jessica Lille Lemoine (Attorney); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 17.88; Credits: 0.00
  • 07/20/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Orange)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/23/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff FOX GLOBAL LOGISTICS CORPORATION against Defendant MICHAEL E. LEKAWA, AN INDIVIDUAL on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by FOX GLOBAL LOGISTICS CORPORATION on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $1,090.41 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $1,185.41.
  • 05/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: FOX GLOBAL LOGISTICS CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/23/2017
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: FOX GLOBAL LOGISTICS CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL E. LEKAWA (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/15/2017
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011642 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --