HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 06:17:49

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc Fka Progress Financial Corp against Juan Jose Rebollar Elizalde in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2271
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Rebollar Elizalde Juan Jose Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Oportun Inc. Fka Progress Financial Corp.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/9/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/25/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
7/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 07/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/21/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. against Defendant Juan Jose Rebollar Elizalde on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $2,605.00.
  • 06/09/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Jose Rebollar Elizalde (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/05/2017; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 07/21/2017
  • 05/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170304E9388 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170304E9388 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Jose Rebollar Elizalde (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --