HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:59:56

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Marissa Bergado against Pedro Rodriguez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2127
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Mendez Christian Joel Rodriguez Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Rodriguez Pedro Dba Pedro's Auto Repair Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Bergado Marissa
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Assignee

    Andrew Larson Dba Hcr Beverly Hills
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/12/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/12/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/3/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/3/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
5/3/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: Andrew Larson dba HCR Beverly Hills (Assignee); As to: Pedro Rodriguez (Defendant); Christian Joel Rodriguez Mendez (Defendant)
  • 09/08/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Andrew Larson dba HCR Beverly Hills (Assignee); As to: Pedro Rodriguez (Defendant); Christian Joel Rodriguez Mendez (Defendant); Interest: 38.92
  • 09/08/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Address for Pedro Rodriguez (Defendant) amendment
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Pedro Rodriguez (Defendant)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 05/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Marissa Bergado against Defendant Pedro Rodriguez DBA Pedro's Auto Repair; Defendant Christian Joel Rodriguez Mendez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Marissa Bergado on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $155.00 for a total of $1,155.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $155.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Pedro Rodriguez DBA Pedro's Auto Repair; Defendant Christian Joel Rodriguez Mendez. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 04/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Pedro Rodriguez (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 04/06/2017
  • 04/12/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Christian Joel Rodriguez Mendez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/10/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 03/06/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 03/06/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Marissa Bergado (Plaintiff)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011246 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marissa Bergado (Plaintiff); As to: Pedro Rodriguez (Defendant); Christian Joel Rodriguez Mendez (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --